+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 10, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 3, 2014.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3046
2/4/2014 9:57:06 AM
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor