+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment 1
Proposed (2/8/2016 1:35:50 PM)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor