+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (2/26/2020 6:44 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/29/2020 4:39 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (2/10/2020 10:41 AM)
Amendment - A7
Recommended (2/26/2020 8:16 AM)