+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 58, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Post, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Nearman.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -A8
Adopted (2/27/2018 8:11 AM)
Amendment -A7
Proposed (2/26/2018 2:41 PM)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (2/26/2018 10:41 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/2/2018 4:24 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/2/2018 9:52 AM)