+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Parrish, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Barton; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/10/2016 3:19:21 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (2/11/2016 8:59:27 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/8/2016 8:13:38 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/9/2016 12:41:58 PM)