+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 23--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Bynum, Findley, Gomberg, Hayden, Helfrich, Lewis, McKeown, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 3--Barker, Clem, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Heard.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/20/2018 10:44 AM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/19/2018 9:45 AM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/19/2018 9:45 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/13/2018 4:03:15 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/12/2018 9:20 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2018 9:21 AM)