+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Rules.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/17/2016 2:10:26 PM)
Amendment 1
Proposed (2/9/2016 8:23:06 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor