+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -4
Combined (2/10/2020 4:20 PM)
Amendment -1
Combined (2/5/2020 4:43 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/5/2020 5:12 PM)