+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Mitchell. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 4--Evans, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 5--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/10/2020 3:52 PM)