+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/10/2022 11:53 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/10/2022 11:53 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/11/2022 2:05 PM)