+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 2--Olsen, Thatcher; excused, 4--Boquist, Knopp, Shields, Winters.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 2--Parrish, Weidner; Absent, 1--Post; Excused, 4--Barnhart, Gilliam, McKeown, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Krieger.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/2/2016 12:38:38 PM)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (2/25/2016 11:50:01 AM)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor