+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 8--Barreto, Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hernandez.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -8
Adopted (2/13/2020 12:55 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/6/2020 1:31 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/10/2020 4:10 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/13/2020 2:20 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/6/2020 1:22 PM)