+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/12/2020 10:02 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/31/2020 12:03 PM)