+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Rules.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson, Gilliam. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Barton, Buckley, Conger, Holvey, Huffman, Kennemer, McLane, Olson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Tomei, Unger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Witt; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Richardson.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Rules.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor