+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3235
2/10/2014 2:21:57 PM
Amendment #3157
2/7/2014 4:09:04 PM
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor