+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 62, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Hicks, Tomei; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #3584
2/21/2014 3:06:47 PM
Amendment #3500
2/19/2014 8:19:21 AM
Amendment #3514
2/19/2014 1:52:11 PM
Amendment #3381
2/12/2014 12:30:07 PM
Amendment #3411
2/12/2014 12:30:07 PM
Amendment #3376
2/12/2014 11:03:59 AM
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor