+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 76, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--George; excused, 1--Starr.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Fagan, Freeman, Gallegos, Gilliam, Hanna, Krieger, McLane, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3654
2/26/2014 12:54:05 PM
Amendment #3681
2/27/2014 2:48:12 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor