+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Mitchell.
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek, Noble. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Greenlick.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/24/2020 8:43 AM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (2/24/2020 8:43 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/19/2020 12:36 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/19/2020 5:11 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/21/2020 7:42 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/21/2020 7:42 PM)