+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Helm; Excused, 1--Wallan.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/6/2020 12:45 PM)