+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 71, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 25; excused, 5--Bates, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Winters.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-26 by unanimous consent.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Wilson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Hayden, Post, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Barton, Gilliam.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/11/2016 3:19:53 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/10/2016 4:10:20 PM)
Amendment -2
Combined (2/10/2016 3:43:33 PM)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor