+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 61, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Clem, Hicks, Lininger, Lively.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek, Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3527
2/19/2014 5:08:24 PM
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor