+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 35, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor