+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter 31, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 5--Anderson, Findley, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Taken from 03-01 Calendar and placed on 03-02 Calendar. Ayes, 22; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 3--Girod, Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Armitage, Boquist, Robinson. Ayes, 22; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 3--Girod, Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Armitage, Boquist, Robinson.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-28 Calendar and placed on 03-01 Calendar. Ayes, 23; Nays, 3--Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson. Ayes, 23; Nays, 3--Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, George, Goodwin, Holvey, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wilde, Zika; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Taken from 02-22 Calendar and placed on 02-23 Calendar.
- Third reading.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/10/2022 1:57 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/1/2022 11:13 AM)