+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 59, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Hicks; Absent, 1--Unger; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel.
- Second reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3522
2/19/2014 4:10:31 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor