+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/6/2020 1:52 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/12/2020 4:13 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (2/13/2020 7:55 AM)