+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Barton, Lininger.
- Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 24--Barton, Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 27, 2014 Calendar.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3623
2/25/2014 6:51:00 AM
Amendment #3597
2/24/2014 7:49:28 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor