+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 113, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (2/26/2018 4:46 PM)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (2/28/2018 12:43 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (2/14/2018 9:37 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/13/2018 1:40 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/9/2018 10:23:03 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/7/2018 9:12 AM)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor