+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 34, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Weidner. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Frederick, Tomei; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3143
2/7/2014 1:11:00 PM
Amendment #3115
2/6/2014 8:24:30 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor