+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 20, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Baertschiger Jr declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to General Government and Accountability.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/9/2018 11:49 AM)