+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Greenlick; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3499
2/19/2014 8:15:17 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor