+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor