+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 58, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Clem, Hicks, Lininger, Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Jenson.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Harker. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #3484
2/18/2014 9:42:34 AM
Amendment #3483
2/18/2014 9:42:34 AM
Amendment #3188
2/10/2014 9:21:05 AM
Amendment #3169
2/10/2014 8:07:14 AM
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor