+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 19, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/12/2018 11:11:25 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/14/2018 11:51 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor