+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 1, (2014 Laws): Effective date February 26, 2014.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.