+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Public Hearing held.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #3536
2/20/2014 9:38:49 AM
Amendment #3259
2/11/2014 7:44:02 AM
Amendment #3300
2/11/2014 11:14:10 AM
Amendment #3139
2/6/2014 4:32:11 PM
Amendment #3103
2/5/2014 4:23:42 PM
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor