+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 1, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 1, 2016.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Monnes Anderson; excused, 3--Boquist, Roblan, Winters.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor