+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 54, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Workforce.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Gomberg, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Reardon, Speaker Kotek.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -4
Combined (2/21/2018 10:10 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/14/2018 9:54 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/8/2018 3:59 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/8/2018 3:59 PM)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor