+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter 30, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Holvey, Smith G.
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/11/2022 2:04 PM)