+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/3/2016 7:19:37 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/8/2016 1:37:01 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/9/2016 4:52:00 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor