+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 8, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 5, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 4, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 3, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 2, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 28, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 27, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 26, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass, subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.