+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 70, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Heard, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, Nearman, Olson, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Absent, 1--Keny-Guyer.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Shields, Winters.
- Ferrioli, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng).
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 12--Barreto, Esquivel, Hack, Heard, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 4--Evans, Krieger, Olson, Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bentz, Vega Pederson.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/16/2016 5:32:35 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/17/2016 4:03:35 PM)
Amendment -MR5
Proposed (2/19/2016 12:46:43 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/15/2016 4:43:51 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor