+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Tomei. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3642
2/25/2014 2:17:33 PM
Amendment #3628
2/25/2014 8:26:33 AM
Amendment #3091
2/5/2014 12:52:29 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor