+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/28/2020 10:58 AM)