+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 7, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Olsen, Winters.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Conger, Hanna, Richardson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3189
2/10/2014 9:28:20 AM
Amendment #3101
2/3/2014 3:51:40 PM
Amendment #3027
2/3/2014 3:51:40 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor