+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to withdraw from Rules failed.Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, Matthews, McKeown, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #3334
2/11/2014 3:43:25 PM
Amendment #3268
2/11/2014 9:36:53 AM
Amendment #3264
2/10/2014 8:09:27 AM
Amendment #3172
2/10/2014 8:09:27 AM