+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 88, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Tomei; Excused, 1--Smith.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Burdick.
- Olsen, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 4--Barnhart, Berger, Greenlick, Olson; Excused, 2--Hicks, Tomei; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Barnhart.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Public Hearing held.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment #3615
2/24/2014 3:19:28 PM
Amendment #3583
2/21/2014 3:06:18 PM
Amendment #3523
2/19/2014 4:49:08 PM
Amendment #3410
2/12/2014 7:37:40 AM
Amendment #3355
2/12/2014 7:37:40 AM
Amendment #3354
2/12/2014 7:37:40 AM
Amendment #3327
2/11/2014 11:03:23 AM
Amendment #3295
2/11/2014 11:03:23 AM
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor