+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment 6
Proposed (2/9/2016 6:12:47 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/8/2016 3:49:04 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/9/2016 8:35:44 AM)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor