+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/4/2020 11:04 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/21/2020 10:27 AM)
Amendment -A3
Recommended (3/3/2020 10:18 AM)