+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 34, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Komp, Nosse.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Health Care.
- Public Hearing held.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/1/2016 12:54:23 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/8/2016 9:10:55 AM)
Amendment -3
Combined (2/11/2016 9:40:13 AM)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor