+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (2/21/2014 11:18:16 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/12/2014 8:27:02 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/5/2016 9:37:12 AM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor